Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Klipsch Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50291 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 31, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Klipsch Group, Inc.
3502 Woodview Trace Suite 200
Indianapolis, IN 46268 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, January 18, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/23 10:24 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/18/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,9 (Day 2 of 2) DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289593)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 01/17 4:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/17/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,9 (Day 1 of 2) DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289592)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Friday, August 31, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 08/31 8:48 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50291] Closed. (btw) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Thu 08/23 9:33 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Harley K Means, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing
Mon 06/25 4:08 PM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Hebenstreit, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Mediator, Notice of Selection of
Wed 06/13 4:22 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Michael Hebenstreit, filed by Harley K Means, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to
Tue 06/12 12:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation . Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 6/26/2018. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Mediation, Motion to Refer to
Mon 06/11 11:54 AM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Thu 04/05 2:19 PM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Requests for Admission . Time to file extended to 5/7/2018. Attorney for Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Thu 04/05 10:40 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Requests for Admission filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/06 4:30 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/28 12:55 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Trial date(s) set on 1/17/2019 and 1/18/2019 in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis at 09:00 AM EST. Exhibit List due by 11/9/2018. Witness List due by 11/9/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/18 The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/28 8:39 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules two (2) day Trial for 1/17/19 and 1/18/19 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (hhd) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 02/20 11:52 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Harley K Means, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 12/21 3:23 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/20/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 2/26/2018 at 11:00 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/20 3:46 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc . (Means, Harley) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/20 2:52 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Klipsch Holding, LLC]. (Means, Harley) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Appearance
Wed 12/20 2:47 PM
Appearance filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 12/19 12:56 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/19 8:58 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Klipsch Group, Inc . (Means, Harley) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/22 12:08 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Klipsch Group, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 11:24 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 10:56 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/17 1:02 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50291 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Klipsch Group, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 11/17 4:14 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50291 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27905268. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |