206
|
|
206
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 07/08 10:13 AM
ORDER CLOSING CASE. The above-styled action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Pursuant to the Parties' request, this Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of their settlement agreement. Jurisdiction will be retained for a period of six months. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
|
205
|
|
205
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/07 11:55 AM
STIPULATION re 204 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,, STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Troy Raines, Richard Silva (Cheek, Christopher)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
order
Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 07/02 6:48 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING CLOSING DOCUMENTS AND CANCELLING TRIAL. According to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman's Paperless Minute Entry for the July 1, 2021 settlement conference, this case has settled. (DE 203 ). The Court congratulates the Parties on their amicable resolution of this matter. The Parties are therefore directed to file a joint stipulation of dismissal within 10 days, which is on or before July 12, 2021 . Moreover, in light of the Parties' settlement, the trial set to begin on July 6, 2021, is CANCELLED. The Parties are also advised that they may move for the Court to retain jurisdiction upon closing the case if necessary to enforce the terms of their settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/2/2021. (apo)
Related: [-]
|
202
|
|
202
3
pgs
order
Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing
Thu 07/01 11:49 AM
Order Resetting Jury Trial for 7/6/2021 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 7/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (kal)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 07/01 6:18 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William Matthewman: The hearing was held by Zoom Video Teleconference. Settlement Conference held on 7/1/2021. Counsel present with their clients. Negotiations held. The case was fully and completely settled. The Settlement was entered and affirmed by all parties on the record. The Court found the settlement was knowingly and voluntarily entered. Written paperwork to be submitted forthwith. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 00 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andres Robles Cruz for Plaintiff, AUSA Christopher Edward Cheek, Andrea Jae Friedman - DOJ Trial Attorney for Defendants Silva and Raines, Richard A. Giuffreda for Defendants Vrchotta, Silver abd, Other appearances: Sgt. Lara PBSO Legal Affairs. (Digital 14:13:46/14:18:36) (kza)
Related: [-]
|