Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12481

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:17-bk-12482
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Dec 31, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Danielson Outdoors Company, Inc.
4510 B St NW Ste A
Auburn, WA 98001-1744
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago
Thursday, December 31, 2020
9 9 utility Corrective Entry Thu 12/31 9:43 AM
Corrective Entry //Entered in Error Related [+] (CB)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 4 pgs order Order Thu 12/31 9:35 AM
Order Dismissing the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 12/31/2020. (CB)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Thu 12/31 9:28 AM
Order Dismissing the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 12/31/2020. (CB)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/04 9:10 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (AJL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
6 6 court Case Reassigned Tue 06/18 9:03 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Signed 6/18/2019. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
5 5 misc Affidavit Tue 03/06 12:49 PM
An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the corporate name change of Danielson Outdoors Company, Inc. to OLDCO DOC, Inc. (DMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 12/20 7:53 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Danielson Outdoors Company, Inc.. (Rucki, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SOFA
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 11/21 1:47 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Maurice Sporting Goods, Inc. (3399); Danielson Outdoors Company, Inc. (0840); South Bend Sporting Goods, Inc. (6658); Triple Crown Holdings, Inc. (1847); and Matzuo America, Inc.(4950). The mailing address for the Debtors corporate headquarters is 1910 Techny Road, Northbrook, Illinois 60065. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Maurice Sporting Goods, Inc., Case No. 17-12481 (CSS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 11/21/2017 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/20 3:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12482 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8661548, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/20 12:33 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Danielson Outdoors Company, Inc.. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 11/20 1:16 PM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (BA)
Related: [-]