Member Case
Lead case is: 1:17-bk-12481

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:17-bk-12483
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Jan 04, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
South Bend Sporting Goods, Inc.
1910 Techny Rd
Northbrook, IL 60062-5308
Represented By
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago
Monday, January 04, 2021
court Close Bankruptcy Case Mon 01/04 10:33 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LBr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 31, 2020
6 6 4 pgs order Order Thu 12/31 9:36 AM
Order Dismissing the Debtors Chapter 11 Cases Signed on 12/31/2020. (CB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
5 5 court Case Reassigned Tue 06/18 9:03 AM
Order of Reassignment of Judge Signed 6/18/2019. Judge Karen B. Owens added to case. Involvement of Judge Christopher S. Sontchi Terminated (BA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
4 4 misc Schedules/Statements Wed 12/20 7:56 AM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by South Bend Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Rucki, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SOFA
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
3 3 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 11/21 1:47 PM
An Order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Maurice Sporting Goods, Inc. (3399); Danielson Outdoors Company, Inc. (0840); South Bend Sporting Goods, Inc. (6658); Triple Crown Holdings, Inc. (1847); and Matzuo America, Inc.(4950). The mailing address for the Debtors corporate headquarters is 1910 Techny Road, Northbrook, Illinois 60065. The docket in the chapter 11 case of Maurice Sporting Goods, Inc., Case No. 17-12481 (CSS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. Signed on 11/21/2017 (DMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 11/20 3:20 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 17-12483 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 8661548, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 17 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 11/20 12:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by South Bend Sporting Goods, Inc.. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 11/20 1:16 PM
Judge Christopher S. Sontchi added to case (BA)
Related: [-]