Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50294
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2017
Terminated:Jan 04, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Petra Industries LLC
2101 S. Kelly
Edmond, OK 73013
Represented By
Petra Industries LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, January 04, 2018
6 6 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/04 3:45 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50294] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2017
5 5 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Wed 12/27 1:14 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/22 12:10 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Petra Industries LLC fdba Petra Industries, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, November 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 11/20 11:26 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 10:58 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2017
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/17 1:17 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50294 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Petra Industries LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other