Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Steve Silver Company
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50301 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 07, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Steve Silver Company
1000 FM 548 North
Forney, TX 75126 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Mon 07/22 1:03 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial1 ,6 . Trial vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/30/2018 (lat) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Mon 07/22 11:03 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial1 ,6 . Trial vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 7/30/2018 . (lat) |
|
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 08/07 9:14 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50301] Closed. (btw) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 07/30 1:38 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Wendy D Brewer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Steve Silver Company. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, May 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to
Wed 05/16 2:00 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney for Defendant Steve Silver Company must distribute this order. (hhd) |
|
Friday, May 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear
Fri 05/11 3:55 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Lydia R Webb on behalf of Defendant Steve Silver Company. (Webb, Lydia) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 05/11 3:56 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice([LINK 17-50301 ) [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A28553208. Fee amount 100.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/09 1:36 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Dispositive motions due by 4/12/2019. Exhibit List due by 5/10/2019. Witness List due by 5/10/2019. Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis at 09:00 AM EDT on 7/18/2019 and 7/19/2019 (Trial time allotted 2 days). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 05/09 9:51 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 05/08/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,6 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (290342)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 05/01 4:05 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Wendy D Brewer, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Steve Silver Company . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Submission
Tue 04/24 12:07 PM
Notice of Submission of Change in Firm Affiliation filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Steve Silver Company. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Mon 03/19 2:34 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 5/1/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 5/8/2018 at 09:45 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 03/16 10:10 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Steve Silver Company. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/16 10:08 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Steve Silver Company . (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Fri 03/16 10:06 AM
Appearance filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Steve Silver Company. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/22 12:14 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Steve Silver Company . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 11:31 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 11:03 AM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 11/17 1:35 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50301 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Steve Silver Company [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |