Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50315
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Jan 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Aerotek, Inc.
7301 Parkway Drive
Hanover, MD 21076
Represented By
Aerotek, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, January 25, 2018
6 6 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/25 1:05 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50315] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2018
5 5 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Wed 01/17 11:09 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:18 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Aerotek, Inc. dba Aerotek Commercial Staffing Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, November 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 11/20 1:35 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 12:42 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 12:41 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50315 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Aerotek, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 11/20 7:13 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50315 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27912319. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1