Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. DEMAR Logisitcs Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50319 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 24, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
DEMAR Logisitcs Inc.
376 East Lies Road
Carol Stream, IL 60188 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, November 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Mon 11/26 11:15 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/19/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,6 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289604)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/24 1:08 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50319] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 04/16 2:48 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by A.J. Webb, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant DEMAR Logisitcs Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/06 4:36 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/01 2:21 PM
Scheduling Order . Dispositive motions due by 8/24/18; Exhibit List due by 9/21/2018. Witness List due by 9/21/2018. Trial date set on 11/19/2018 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis, (time allotted is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/28 12:24 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 11/19/18 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (lat) |
|
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Pretrial Statement
Thu 02/15 11:13 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by A.J. Webb, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant DEMAR Logisitcs Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 12/26 4:08 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of Defendant DEMAR Logisitcs Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 12/21 3:26 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/20/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 2/27/2018 at 09:00 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 12/20 9:30 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 1/3/2018. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 12/19 4:51 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of Defendant DEMAR Logisitcs Inc . (Webb, A.J.) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 12/19 4:41 PM
Appearance filed by A.J. Webb on behalf of Defendant DEMAR Logisitcs Inc. (Webb, A.J.) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:22 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: DEMAR Logisitcs Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 1:40 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 1:06 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 1:06 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50319 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) DEMAR Logisitcs Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |