Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. John Tisdel Distributing, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50327 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
John Tisdel Distributing, Inc.
7177 Central Parke Bouelvard
Mason, OH 45040 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/01 4:30 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/01/2018, MATTER: Trial : Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 (Day 2 of 2) DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289027)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Wednesday, October 31, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/01 4:27 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/31/2018, MATTER: Trial : Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 (Day 1 of 2) DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289026)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Tuesday, October 16, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 10/17 9:36 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/16/2018, MATTER: Final Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,8 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289025)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 06/26 1:02 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50327] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Fri 06/15 1:49 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jason V Stitt, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant John Tisdel Distributing, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/06 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/14 3:41 PM
Scheduling Order Setting Final Telephonic PreTrial Conference, Trial and Setting Cut-off Dates . Exhibit List due by 8/24/2018. Witness List due by 8/24/2018. Discovery due by 9/21/18. Dispositive Motions due by 7/27/18. Trial date set in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis on 10/31/2018 at 10:00 AM EDT and 11/1/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT (Time alloted is 2 days). Final Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 10/16/2018 at 09:30 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3961. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/14 11:55 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules two (2) day Trial for 10/31/18 beginning at 10:00 am and 11/1/18 beginning at 9:00 am. Court sets final Telephonic Pretrial Conference for 10/16/18 at 9:30 am. Parties may appear telephonically for the final Pretrial Conference at 317-229-3961 unless otherwise noticed by Court. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (lat) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Mon 01/29 10:14 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jason V Stitt, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant John Tisdel Distributing, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 12/21 3:28 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/6/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 2/13/2018 at 11:00 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3961. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/20 2:54 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jason V Stitt on behalf of Defendant John Tisdel Distributing, Inc. (Stitt, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/20 2:27 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jason V Stitt on behalf of Defendant John Tisdel Distributing, Inc . (Stitt, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 12/20 12:53 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Deficiency to be cured by 1/3/2018. (cmd) |
|
6 | 6
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to
Wed 12/20 12:52 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney for Defendant John Tisdel Distributing, Inc. Defendant Tisdel Distributing must distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear
Mon 12/18 2:33 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Jason V Stitt on behalf of Defendant John Tisdel Distributing, Inc. (Stitt, Jason) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 12/18 2:33 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50327 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28010559. Fee amount 100.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: John Tisdel Distributing, Inc. dba Tisdel Distributing . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 2:33 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 1:35 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 1:35 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50327 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) John Tisdel Distributing, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |