Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50328
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Oct 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lifestyle Solutions, Inc.
5555 Auto Mall Parkway
Fremont, CA 94538
Represented By
Lifestyle Solutions, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, December 10, 2018
20 20 court Minute Entry/Order Tue 12/11 3:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/10/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,6 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289610)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
19 19 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/25 7:54 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50328] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
18 18 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Wed 10/17 12:56 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Patrick W Carothers, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Lifestyle Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
17 17 3 pgs order Order (Generic) Thu 08/30 3:52 PM
Order Establishing Briefing Schedule on Defendant's Demand for Jury Trial Related [+]. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw)
Related: [-] 16
Tuesday, August 28, 2018
16 16 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 08/29 11:36 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 08/28/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Status Conference: Defendant's Demand for a Jury Trial6 ,11 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (295972)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
15 15 court Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc. Fri 07/27 10:30 AM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 8/28/2018 at 10:30 AM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. (lat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/06 4:31 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, March 01, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/01 2:58 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 9/14/18; Exhibit List due by 10/12/2018. Witness List due by 10/12/2018. Trial date set on 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis.(Time alloted due by 1 day) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, February 26, 2018
12 12 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 02/28 8:39 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 12/10/18 at 9:00 am. Parties consent to Bankruptcy Court conducting jury trial. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines Related [+]. (hhd)
Related: [-] 1 ,6
Tuesday, February 20, 2018
11 11 misc Pretrial Statement Tue 02/20 9:27 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Patrick W Carothers, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Lifestyle Solutions, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, January 04, 2018
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 01/04 2:50 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Lifestyle Solutions, Inc. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Setting Pretrial Conference Thu 01/04 2:23 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/20/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 2/26/2018 at 01:30 PM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2017
8 8 order Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Fri 12/22 5:16 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Attorney for Defendant Lifestyle Solutions, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 12/22 10:50 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/5/2018. (btw)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 12/20 6:39 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Lifestyle Solutions, Inc Related [+]. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear Wed 12/20 6:37 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Patrick W Carothers on behalf of Defendant Lifestyle Solutions, Inc. (Carothers, Patrick)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 12/20 6:38 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50328 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28022592. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 5
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:28 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Lifestyle Solutions, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, November 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 11/20 2:34 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 1:38 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 1:37 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50328 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Lifestyle Solutions, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other