Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. LinkedIn Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50329 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
LinkedIn Corporation
1000 W. Maude Avenue
Sunnyvale, CA 94085 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/21 10:08 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50329] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/13 10:53 AM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count, filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Casteel, Kara) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Tue 02/13 10:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 02/13 10:50 AM
Appearance filed by Kara E. Casteel on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Casteel, Kara) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:29 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: LinkedIn Corporation . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 2:35 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 1:46 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 1:45 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50329 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) LinkedIn Corporation [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |