Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50333 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc.
8000 S. Federal Way
Boise, ID 83716 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 65 minutes ago |
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/13 3:03 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/11/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,11 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (295227)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Friday, October 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/26 8:46 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50333] Closed. (btw) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Thu 10/18 9:54 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by John J. Morse, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 06/28 2:35 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Exhibit List due by 12/14/2018. Dispositive motions due by 11/09/2018. Witness List due by 12/14/2018. Trial date set on 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Trial time allotted ia 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 06/27 2:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 06/26/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,11 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (292714)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 06/12 9:52 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by John J. Morse, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Mon 05/07 1:11 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 6/12/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 6/26/2018 at 09:15 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 05/03 3:45 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by John J. Morse on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc . (Morse, John) |
|
Friday, April 20, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Consent Language Notice
Fri 04/20 9:37 AM
Notice re: Consent Language . An amended document must be filed by 05/04/2018. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 04/18 1:32 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by John J. Morse on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Micron Technology, Inc.]. (Morse, John) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 04/18 1:30 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by John J. Morse on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc . (Morse, John) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 04/10 1:25 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 4/24/2018. (cmd) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 04/10 10:43 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by John J. Morse on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc . (Morse, John) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 04/10 10:41 AM
Appearance filed by John J. Morse on behalf of Defendant Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc. (Morse, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:32 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc. dba Micron CPG, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 2:39 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 1:57 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 1:56 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50333 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Micron Consumer Products Group, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |