Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50336
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Oct 10, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Needle, Inc.
14864 Pony Express Road
Bluffdale, UT 84065
Represented By
Needle, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, August 03, 2020
12 12 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 08/03 12:53 PM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
11 11 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/10 9:38 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50336] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Thu 09/27 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, September 24, 2018
9 9 order Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Mon 09/24 11:21 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Needle, Inc Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, September 20, 2018
8 8 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Thu 09/20 9:31 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 08/27 12:42 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Needle, Inc Related [+]. (btw)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 misc Affidavit Mon 08/27 10:46 AM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of Mon 08/27 10:45 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:33 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Needle, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, November 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 11/20 2:41 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 2:04 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 2:04 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50336 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Needle, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other