Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. PCMS Datafit Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50337 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
PCMS Datafit Inc.
25 Merchant Street Executive Centre 3, Suite 400
Cincinnati, OH 45246 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 05/07 1:49 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50337] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Thu 04/26 11:13 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Mon 12/18 9:40 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 1/31/2018. Attorney for Defendant PCMS Datafit Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Fri 12/15 11:05 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant PCMS Datafit Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 12/15 11:04 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant PCMS Datafit Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): PCMS International Inc.]. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Fri 12/15 11:01 AM
Appearance filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant PCMS Datafit Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:35 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: PCMS Datafit Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 2:42 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 2:07 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 2:07 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50337 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) PCMS Datafit Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |