Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50340
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Jun 15, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Signifyd, Inc.
2540 North 1st Street Suite 300
San Jose, CA 95131
Represented By
Signifyd, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, February 11, 2019
20 20 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 02/13 3:03 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/11/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,11 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (290970)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
19 19 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 06/15 3:50 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50340] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
18 18 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Wed 06/06 1:51 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Meredith R. Theisen, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Signifyd, Inc. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 18, 2018
17 17 notice Appearance Fri 05/18 3:23 PM
Appearance filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Signifyd, Inc. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
16 16 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/29 2:31 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 11/9/18. Exhibit List due by 12/14/2018. Witness List due by 12/14/2018. Trial date set on 2/11/2019 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Time allotted for Trial is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 15
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
15 15 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 03/28 1:19 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 2/11/19 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines Related [+]. (lat)
Related: [-] 1 ,11
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
14 14 misc Pretrial Statement Tue 03/20 8:48 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by John C. Hoard, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Signifyd, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 13
Thursday, February 01, 2018
13 13 order Setting Pretrial Conference Thu 02/01 1:45 PM
Amended Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 3/20/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 3/27/2018 at 10:30 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3961. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
12 12 order Setting Pretrial Conference Wed 01/31 2:10 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 3/20/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 3/27/2018 at 10:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/30 10:22 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Signifyd, Inc Related [+]. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, December 29, 2017
10 10 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/29 8:44 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Signifyd, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
9 9 order Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to Wed 12/20 12:50 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Time to file extended to 1/31/2018. Attorney for Defendant Signifyd, Inc. must distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 7
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
8 8 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 12/19 12:43 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 5
7 7 motion Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to Tue 12/19 10:20 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Signifyd, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 10:16 AM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Signifyd, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 10:15 AM
Appearance filed by John C. Hoard on behalf of Defendant Signifyd, Inc. (Hoard, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Signifyd, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Monday, November 20, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Mon 11/20 2:45 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 2:14 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 2:13 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50340 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Signifyd, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other