Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50341 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 11, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp.
70 Karago Avenue
Youngstown, OH 44512 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 09/20 3:42 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 09/20/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 [1,6] DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (290014)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/11 10:12 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50341] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 04/03 1:21 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Eric C Redman, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 03/08 1:52 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Dispositive motions due by 6/29/18. Exhibit List due by 7/27/2018. Witness List due by 7/27/2018. Trial date set on 9/20/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Trial time allotted is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 03/07 11:34 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 9/20/18 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (lat) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Mon 02/12 9:29 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Eric C Redman, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, January 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 01/10 11:55 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp. |
|
9 | 9
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Wed 01/10 10:35 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/27/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 3/6/2018 at 11:00 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 01/09 12:58 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 1/23/2018. (cmd) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Submission
Tue 01/09 9:41 AM
Notice of Submission Statement of Consent filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp. |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 01/09 9:32 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp . |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 01/09 9:25 AM
Appearance filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp. |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 2:46 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 2:27 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 2:26 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50341 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corp. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |