Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Trintech Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50346 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 25, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Trintech Inc.
15851 Dallas Parkway Suite 900
Addison, TX 75001 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 62 minutes ago |
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/25 10:49 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50346] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Tue 04/17 1:41 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Striking Deficient or Incomplete Filing
Wed 03/07 2:00 PM
Order Striking Deficient Filing . The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
14 | 14
order
Striking Deficient or Incomplete Filing
Wed 03/07 1:59 PM
Order Striking Deficient Filing . The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Wed 01/31 10:36 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 2/28/2018. Attorney for Defendant Trintech Inc. Defendant Chesapeake System Solutions, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
12 | 12
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Wed 01/31 10:35 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement . Time to file extended to 2/28/2018. Attorney for Defendant Trintech Inc. Defendant Chesapeake System Solutions, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, January 30, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Tue 01/30 6:33 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Trintech Inc. (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Tue 01/30 5:10 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Trintech Inc. (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Thu 01/04 4:07 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement . Time to file extended to 1/30/2018. Attorney for Defendant Trintech Inc. Defendant Chesapeake System Solutions, Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Tue 01/02 3:38 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Trintech Inc. (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 12/19 10:40 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/18 6:55 PM
Appearance filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Trintech Inc. (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/18 6:54 PM
Appearance filed by James E Rossow Jr. on behalf of Defendant Trintech Inc. (Rossow, James) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Trintech Inc. fdba Chesapeake System Solutions, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 3:07 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 2:40 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 2:39 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50346 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Trintech Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |