Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Zico LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50350 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Zico LLC
337 Polaris Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46241 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Returned Mail Received by Court
Fri 10/12 2:56 PM
Returned Mail received from the BNC for Defendant Zico LLC . (brb) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 9:40 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50350] Closed. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Order
Thu 09/27 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/26/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Default Judgment, Order on Motion for
Mon 09/24 11:36 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Zico LLC . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment, Motion for
Thu 09/20 9:40 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 08/27 12:23 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Zico LLC . (btw) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/27 10:35 AM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of
Mon 08/27 10:31 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:45 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Zico LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/20 3:13 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/04/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/20/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 2:48 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 2:48 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50350 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Zico LLC [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |