Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Cybertron International Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50357 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cybertron International Inc.
4747 South Emporia Street
Wichita, KS 67216 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 51 minutes ago |
Monday, March 11, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Mon 03/11 3:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 03/11/2019, MATTER: Trial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,9 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (298706)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 01/07 2:30 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50357] Closed. (lak) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Thu 12/27 10:11 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Cybertron International Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/12 3:39 PM
Scheduling Order . Exhibit List due by 1/11/2019. Witness List due by 1/11/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/07/2018. Trial date set on 3/11/2019 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Trial time allotted is one (1) day The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 09/12 12:06 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 09/11/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,9 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (296709)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Tue 09/04 12:34 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Cybertron International Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Wed 08/01 1:46 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 9/4/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 9/11/2018 at 09:30 AM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/30 3:45 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Cybertron International Inc . (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Tue 12/05 9:09 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 1/31/2018. Attorney for Defendant Cybertron International Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Mon 12/04 1:08 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Cybertron International Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Mon 12/04 1:07 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Cybertron International Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Mon 12/04 1:05 PM
Appearance filed by Jonathan David Sundheimer on behalf of Defendant Cybertron International Inc. (Sundheimer, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 1:49 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Cybertron International Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 11/21 9:55 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 3:17 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 3:16 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50357 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Cybertron International Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |