Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Dealnews.com, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50359 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Dealnews.com, Inc.
101 Quality Circle Suite 100
Huntsville, AL 35806 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/12 1:47 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50359] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Fri 03/02 2:04 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 1:51 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: dealnews.com, Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 11/21 9:56 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 3:26 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 3:26 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50359 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Dealnews.com, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |