Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50371
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Jun 26, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
HoMedics USA, LLC
3000 North Pontiac Trail
Commerce Township, MI 48390
Represented By
HoMedics USA, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, April 26, 2019
22 22 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Tue 04/30 8:33 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial1 ,11 Trial vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 6/15/2018 (lat)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
21 21 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/26 1:04 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50371] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 15, 2018
20 20 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Fri 06/15 1:54 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Shannon L. Deeby, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 19, 2018
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/19 1:27 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 1/18/2019. Exhibit List due by 2/22/2019. Witness List due by 2/22/2019. Trial date set on 4/26/2019 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 131 U.S. Courthouse, Terre Haute (Trial time allotted is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
18 18 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 04/18 9:51 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/17/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,11 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289748)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
17 17 misc Pretrial Statement Mon 04/09 4:22 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Shannon L. Deeby, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, March 02, 2018
16 16 order Setting Pretrial Conference Fri 03/02 2:15 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 4/10/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 4/17/2018 at 11:15 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/28 11:57 AM
Certificate of Service re: Notice of Substitution and Withdrawal of Appearance, filed by Shannon L. Deeby on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC Related [+]. (Deeby, Shannon)
Related: [-] 10
14 14 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 02/28 10:09 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Notice of Substitution and Withdrawal of Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 3/14/2018. (btw)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 02/27 5:35 PM
Certificate of Service re: Answer to Complaint, Corporate Ownership Statement, filed by Shannon L. Deeby on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC Related [+]. (Deeby, Shannon)
Related: [-] 11 ,12
12 12 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 02/27 5:34 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Shannon L. Deeby on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC [Corporate Parent(s): FKA Distributing Co. LLC]. (Deeby, Shannon)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/27 5:33 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Shannon L. Deeby on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC Related [+]. (Deeby, Shannon)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, February 26, 2018
10 10 notice Substitution and Withdrawal of Appearance, Notice of Mon 02/26 3:30 PM
Notice of Substitution and Withdrawal of Appearance of David T. Lin by Shannon L. Deeby, filed by Shannon L. Deeby on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC. (Deeby, Shannon)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Mon 02/26 12:52 PM
Order Granting Motion filed by Shannon L. Deeby to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC re: Doc #8 ). Attorney for Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC must distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear Fri 02/23 1:28 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Shannon L. Deeby on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC. (Deeby, Shannon)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 02/23 1:34 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50371 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28236153. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, December 07, 2017
7 7 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/07 11:10 AM
Certificate of Service re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by David T Lin on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC Related [+]. (Lin, David)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
6 6 order Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to Wed 11/29 2:05 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Attorney for Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC must distribute this order. (lak)
Related: [-] 4
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: HoMedics USA, LLC Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, November 28, 2017
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear Tue 11/28 10:20 AM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by David T Lin on behalf of Defendant HoMedics USA, LLC. (Lin, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 11/28 10:26 AM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50371 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27932050. Fee amount 100.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Tue 11/21 10:18 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 4:06 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 4:06 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50371 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) HoMedics USA, LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other