Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Technology Evaluation Centers Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50386 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Technology Evaluation Centers Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Thursday, July 25, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Fri 07/26 2:19 PM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,13 . Trial vacated. Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 5/15/2019 . (lat) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/23 9:02 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50386] Closed. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Wed 05/15 10:45 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Eric C Redman, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Mon 01/07 8:54 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production and and Admissions . Time to file extended to 2/11/2019. Attorney for Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc. must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Thursday, January 03, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Thu 01/03 12:32 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production and and Admissions filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc. |
|
Friday, December 07, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 12/07 3:28 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Trial date set on 7/25/2019 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Dispositive motions due by 4/19/2019. Exhibit List due by 5/24/2019. Witness List due by 5/24/2019. Trial time allotted is one (1) day. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 12/06 12:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/04/2018, MATTER: Continued Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,13 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (300988)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Tuesday, October 30, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 10/31 10:48 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/30/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,13 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (298948)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Friday, October 19, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Pretrial Statement
Fri 10/19 10:13 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Eric C Redman, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Mon 09/17 10:54 AM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 10/23/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 10/30/2018 at 09:30 AM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Friday, September 14, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 09/14 12:03 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Technology Evaluation Centers Inc.]. |
|
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/28 11:37 AM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc . |
|
12 | 12
court
Consent Language Notice
Tue 08/28 10:24 AM
Notice re: Consent Language . An amended document must be filed by 09/11/2018. (btw) |
|
11 | 11
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 08/28 10:23 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 9/11/2018. (btw) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/27 4:14 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc . |
|
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Mon 08/27 4:13 PM
Appearance filed by Eric C Redman on behalf of Defendant Technology Evaluation Centers Inc. |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Thu 04/05 2:13 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Technology Evaluation Centers Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 02/27 4:43 PM
Alias Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . Adversary Answer due by 8/27/2018. (kao) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 02/23 2:09 PM
Alias Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 03/09/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/27/2018. (btw) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Request for Alias Summons
Fri 02/23 11:23 AM
Request for Alias Summons re: Technology Evaluation Centers Inc., filed by Gary D Underdahl . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 11/21 10:39 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Tue 11/21 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/20/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 11/28/2017. (Admin) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 5:39 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 5:39 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50386 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Technology Evaluation Centers Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |