Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50387
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Oct 10, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Appliance Professionals LLC
5808 Cooper Road
Westerville, OH 43081
Represented By
The Appliance Professionals LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 10, 2018
12 12 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 10/10 10:13 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50387] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 26, 2018
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Thu 09/27 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/26/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, September 24, 2018
10 10 order Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Mon 09/24 11:35 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) The Appliance Professionals LLC Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, September 20, 2018
9 9 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Thu 09/20 9:39 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 27, 2018
8 8 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 08/27 12:26 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against The Appliance Professionals LLC Related [+]. (btw)
Related: [-] 6
7 7 misc Affidavit Mon 08/27 10:38 AM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 misc Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of Mon 08/27 10:37 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:23 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: The Appliance Professionals LLC Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Tue 11/21 10:39 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Tue 11/21 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/20/2017 Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 11/28/2017. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, November 20, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 5:42 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 5:42 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50387 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) The Appliance Professionals LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other