Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50389
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 20, 2017
Terminated:Feb 22, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
USIlluminations, LLC
3757 Fishcreek Road
Stow, OH 44224
Represented By
USIlluminations, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, February 22, 2018
7 7 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 02/22 1:27 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50389] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
6 6 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Wed 02/14 1:19 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: USIlluminations, LLC Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Tue 11/21 10:41 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Tue 11/21 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/20/2017 Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 11/28/2017. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1
Monday, November 20, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 11/20 5:48 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/20 5:47 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50389 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) USIlluminations, LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other