Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Venis Trucking, LLC.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50390 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Venis Trucking, LLC.
7555 W. State Road 32
Lebanon, IN 46052 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 22, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/23 10:33 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/22/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,7 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (291465)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/30 9:21 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50390] Closed. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Wed 08/22 9:52 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jeremy Lee Fetty, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Venis Trucking, LLC. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 04/11 11:12 AM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018. Exhibit List due by 11/16/2018. Witness List due by 11/16/2018. Trial date set on 1/22/2019 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis (Time Allotted for Trial is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Mon 04/09 2:47 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 1/22/19 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines. Defendant consents to entry of final orders and judgment by the Bankruptcy Court . (lat) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Thu 03/29 4:14 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jeremy Lee Fetty, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Venis Trucking, LLC . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/07 5:08 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jeremy Lee Fetty on behalf of Defendant Venis Trucking, LLC. (Fetty, Jeremy) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Fri 02/02 1:27 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 4/2/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 4/9/2018 at 11:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 02/01 8:26 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 2/15/2018. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/31 2:28 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jeremy Lee Fetty on behalf of Defendant Venis Trucking, LLC . (Fetty, Jeremy) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Wed 01/31 2:22 PM
Appearance filed by Jeremy Lee Fetty on behalf of Defendant Venis Trucking, LLC. (Fetty, Jeremy) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 2:25 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Venis Trucking, LLC . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 11/21 10:42 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Tue 11/21 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/20/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 11/28/2017. (Admin) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 11/20 5:50 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 11/20 5:49 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50390 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Venis Trucking, LLC. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |