Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50393
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Jun 26, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
89 Degrees, Inc.
25 Burlington Mall Road Suite 610
Burlington, MA 01803
Represented By
89 Degrees, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, September 06, 2018
16 16 court Minute Entry/Order Mon 09/17 9:12 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 09/06/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,9 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (290607)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 26, 2018
15 15 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 06/26 1:09 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50393] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 18, 2018
14 14 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Mon 06/18 9:52 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Christine K. Jacobson, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant 89 Degrees, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/22 1:13 PM
Scheduling Order Setting Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 6/29/18. Exhibit List due by 7/27/2018. Witness List due by 7/27/2018. Trial date set on 9/6/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis(Time alloted for trial is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
12 12 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 03/21 11:18 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 9/6/18 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines Related [+]. (lat)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Tuesday, March 13, 2018
11 11 misc Pretrial Statement Tue 03/13 3:25 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Christine K. Jacobson, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant 89 Degrees, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, January 22, 2018
10 10 order Setting Pretrial Conference Mon 01/22 1:32 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 3/13/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 3/20/2018 at 09:30 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/18 11:28 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by Christine K. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant 89 Degrees, Inc Related [+]. (Jacobson, Christine)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, December 28, 2017
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 12/28 2:10 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Christine K. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant 89 Degrees, Inc. (Jacobson, Christine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
7 7 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 12/19 2:36 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 5
6 6 notice Extension of Time to File, Notice of Tue 12/19 11:08 AM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Christine K. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant 89 Degrees, Inc Related [+]. Adversary Answer due by 1/18/2018. (Jacobson, Christine)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 11:02 AM
Appearance filed by Christine K. Jacobson on behalf of Defendant 89 Degrees, Inc. (Jacobson, Christine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:48 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: 89 Degrees, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Tue 11/21 12:59 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 12:34 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 12:33 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50393 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) 89 Degrees, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 11/21 5:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50393 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27918307. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1