Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. ASAP Furniture Services LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50395 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 09, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ASAP Furniture Services LLC
287 Paulding Boulevard
Dallas, GA 30157 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 09, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 10/09 10:05 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50395] Closed. (btw) |
|
Sunday, September 23, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
![]() BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/23/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, September 21, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Default Judgment against Defendant(s) ASAP Furniture Services LLC . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default against ASAP Furniture Services LLC . (btw) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: ASAP Furniture Services LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 17-50395 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) ASAP Furniture Services LLC [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 11/21 5:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50395 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27918307. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |