Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50396
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Feb 27, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
AT&T Inc.
2508 S. Akard
Dallas, TX 75202
Represented By
AT&T Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
6 6 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/27 9:36 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50396] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 19, 2018
5 5 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Mon 02/19 1:18 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:50 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: AT&T Inc. dba AT&T Teleconference Services Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Tue 11/21 1:02 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/05/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/21/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 12:44 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 12:43 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50396 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) AT&T Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 11/21 5:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50396 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27918307. Fee amount 350.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1