Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50398 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens
301 East Carmel Drive
Carmel, IN 46032 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/28 12:25 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Vacated: Stipulation of Dismissal filed 1/16/2018 . (lat) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Submission
Wed 01/31 7:59 AM
Notice of Submission of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Steven M. Lutz on behalf of Defendant Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens. (Lutz, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/24 1:03 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50398] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 01/16 12:30 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Steven M. Lutz, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Fri 01/05 11:36 AM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/20/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 2/27/2018 at 09:30 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 12/22 2:36 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Steven M. Lutz on behalf of Defendant Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens. (Lutz, Steven) |
|
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Fri 12/22 9:35 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 1/5/2018. (btw) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 12/21 6:30 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Steven M. Lutz on behalf of Defendant Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens . (Lutz, Steven) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Thu 12/21 6:26 PM
Appearance filed by Steven M. Lutz on behalf of Defendant Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens. (Lutz, Steven) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:51 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 8:58 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 12:50 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 12:49 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50398 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Chateau Designs LLC Chateau Kitchens [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 11/21 5:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50398 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27918307. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |