Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Cintas Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50399 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cintas Corporation
6000 Cintas Blvd.
Cincinnati, OH 45262 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Fri 10/19 8:33 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/18/2018, MATTER: Trial : Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 [1,8] DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (288682)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 04/04 12:41 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50399] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 03/27 10:14 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Jason V Stitt, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Cintas Corporation, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 03/06 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 02/07 3:14 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Exhibit List due by 8/24/2018. Witness List due by 8/24/2018. Dispositive motions due by 7/27/18. Trial date set on 10/18/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Trial time allotted is one (1) day. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/07 10:54 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules Trial for 10/18/18 at 9:00 am for one (1) day. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (lat) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Mon 01/22 10:25 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Jason V Stitt, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Cintas Corporation, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 12/21 3:45 PM
Order Setting Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 1/31/2018. Pretrial Conference set on 2/6/2018 at 10:00 AM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3961. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/20 2:43 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jason V Stitt on behalf of Defendant Cintas Corporation [Corporate Parent(s): Cintas Corporation No. 3]. (Stitt, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 12/20 2:39 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Jason V Stitt on behalf of Defendant Cintas Corporation . (Stitt, Jason) |
|
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 12/20 12:46 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Deficiency to be cured by 1/3/2018. (cmd) |
|
6 | 6
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice, Order on Motion to
Wed 12/20 12:45 PM
Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Attorney for Defendant Cintas Corporation must distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear
Mon 12/18 2:44 PM
Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Jason V Stitt on behalf of Defendant Cintas Corporation. (Stitt, Jason) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Mon 12/18 2:45 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50399 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28010659. Fee amount 100.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:52 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Cintas Corporation . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 8:58 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 12:53 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 12:52 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50399 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Cintas Corporation [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 11/21 5:51 PM
Receipt of Complaint 17-50399 [cmp,cmp] (350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 27918307. Fee amount 350.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |