Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Electrical Distributing, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50405 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 06, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Electrical Distributing, Inc.
4600 NW St. Helens Road
Portland, OR 97210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
court
Minute Entry/Order
Fri 03/01 10:33 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/28/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,6 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (291407)). (HHeiserDavis) |
|
Wednesday, June 06, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 06/06 9:53 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50405] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 05/29 12:46 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by John R. Humphrey, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Electrical Distributing, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/09 3:30 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates . Dispositive motions due by 11/9/2018. Exhibit List due by 12/28/2018. Witness List due by 12/28/2018. Trial date set on 2/28/2019 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order(Time allotted is 1 day). (cmd) |
|
12 | 12
court
Minute Entry/Order
Mon 04/09 2:46 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 2/28/19 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines . (lat) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pretrial Statement
Mon 04/02 9:56 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by John R. Humphrey, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant Electrical Distributing, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 02/07 2:37 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Electrical Distributing, Inc. (Humphrey, John) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Thu 02/01 1:47 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 4/2/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 4/9/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd) |
|
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Thu 02/01 11:20 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 2/15/2018. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Appearance
Wed 01/31 11:11 AM
Appearance filed by Michael P. O'Neil on behalf of Defendant Electrical Distributing, Inc. (O'Neil, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 01/31 11:08 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Electrical Distributing, Inc . (Humphrey, John) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Wed 01/31 11:05 AM
Appearance filed by John R. Humphrey on behalf of Defendant Electrical Distributing, Inc. (Humphrey, John) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 4:01 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Electrical Distributing, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 9:06 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 1:16 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 1:16 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50405 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Electrical Distributing, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |