Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Home Accents, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50414 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 03, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Home Accents, LLC
1200 Garden Highway #B
Yuba City, CA 95991 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago |
Wednesday, October 03, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/03 10:44 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50414] Closed. (tsw) |
|
Tuesday, September 25, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Letter/Correspondence
Tue 09/25 12:57 PM
Letter/Correspondence dated 9/21/2018 filed by Home Accents. (lad) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Order
Fri 09/21 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/20/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 09/19 12:06 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 09/18/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Show Cause Hearing re: Plaintiff's Failure to Prosecute DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (297340)). (LauraATrepes) |
|
24 | 24
order
Default Judgment, Order on Motion for
Tue 09/18 11:27 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Home Accents, LLC . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Monday, September 17, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Submission
Mon 09/17 10:35 AM
Notice of Submission of Default Judgment filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Default Judgment, Motion for
Mon 09/17 10:30 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Fri 09/07 10:31 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Home Accents, LLC . (btw) |
|
Wednesday, August 29, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Change of Address, Notice of
Wed 08/29 11:17 AM
Notice of Change of Address for Defendant Home Accents, LLC filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/27 10:54 AM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of
Mon 08/27 10:53 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Setting Pretrial Conference
Tue 08/14 12:04 PM
Order to Appear and Show Cause for Failure to Prosecute. Telephonic hearing set on 9/18/2018 at 09:30 AM EDT via a teleconference at 877-848-7030; access code 8891756. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
order
Withdraw as Attorney, Order on Motion to
Wed 02/14 8:29 AM
Order Granting Motion filed by Wendy D. Brewer to Withdraw as Defendant's Attorney . Attorney for Defendant Home Accents, LLC must distribute this order. (lat) |
|
Tuesday, February 13, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw As Attorney, Motion to
Tue 02/13 11:38 AM
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Home Accents, LLC. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Tue 01/23 3:15 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Home Accents, LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
13 | 13
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 01/23 12:48 PM
Alias Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 02/06/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 2/22/2018. (cmd) |
|
12 | 12
cmp
Request for Alias Summons
Tue 01/23 10:07 AM
Request for Alias Summons re: Home Accents, LLC, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Extension of Time to File, Notice of
Wed 12/27 10:16 AM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer or other Responsive Pleading filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Home Accents, LLC . Time to file extended to 1/24/2018. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/27 10:13 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Home Accents, LLC. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Wed 12/27 10:11 AM
Appearance filed by Wendy D. Brewer on behalf of Defendant Home Accents, LLC. (Brewer, Wendy) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 4:22 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Home Accents, LLC . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 11/27 2:41 PM
Alias Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/11/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/27/2017. (btw) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/27 10:37 AM
Amended Complaint (no parties added), filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 11/27 10:05 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 12/11/2017 (btw) CORRECTION: Issued in error. Modified on 11/27/2017 (btw) |
|
4 | 4
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Mon 11/27 10:03 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 12/11/2017. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 9:29 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 1:43 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 1:42 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50414 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Home Accents, LLC [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |