Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50416
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Oct 30, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
IPC Workers LLC
2031 Silver Lane Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46203
Represented By
IPC Workers LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 30, 2018
11 11 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/30 9:12 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50416] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Service - Order Thu 10/18 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 10/17/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, October 15, 2018
9 9 order Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Mon 10/15 12:29 PM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) IPC Workers LLC Related [+]. Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (lak)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, October 11, 2018
8 8 motion Default Judgment, Motion for Thu 10/11 12:53 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 09, 2018
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 10/09 7:24 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default against IPC Workers LLC Related [+]. (btw)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, October 08, 2018
6 6 misc Affidavit Mon 10/08 11:50 AM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 misc Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of Mon 10/08 11:49 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 4:23 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: IPC Workers LLC Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 9:31 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 2:04 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 2:03 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50416 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) IPC Workers LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other