Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50420
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Apr 11, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
M S Ray LLC
1183 S. Cunningham Lane
Martinsville, IN 46151
Represented By
M S Ray LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
15 15 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 04/25 10:00 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/24/2018, MATTER: Continued Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502 [1,10] DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (290609)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 11, 2018
14 14 court Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 04/11 10:13 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50420] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2018
13 13 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Tue 04/03 10:17 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by John Joseph Allman, Christopher E. Baker, Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Defendant M S Ray LLC, Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, U.S. Trustee. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 20, 2018
12 12 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 03/21 11:19 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Attorney for Defendant orally consents to the Bankruptcy Court entering final orders and or judgments. Court continues Pretrial Conference to 4/24/18 at 9:15 am. Parties to appear telephonically for the continued Telephonic Pretrial Conference at 317-229-3960 unless otherwise noticed by Court Related [+]. (lat)
Related: [-] 1 ,10
Monday, January 22, 2018
11 11 order Setting Pretrial Conference Mon 01/22 1:28 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 3/13/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 3/20/2018 at 10:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/19 1:26 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant M S Ray LLC Related [+]. (Baker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1
9 9 notice Appearance Fri 01/19 1:23 PM
Appearance filed by John Joseph Allman on behalf of Defendant M S Ray LLC. (Allman, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 12/20 2:22 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant M S Ray LLC [Corporate Parent(s): M S Ray LLC]. (Baker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
7 7 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 12/19 12:37 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Notice of Extension of Time to File Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Extension of Time to File, Notice of Tue 12/19 9:34 AM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant M S Ray LLC Related [+]. Adversary Answer due by 1/19/2018. (Baker, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
5 5 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 9:27 AM
Appearance filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant M S Ray LLC. (Baker, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: M S Ray LLC Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 9:54 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 2:16 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 2:15 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50420 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) M S Ray LLC [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other