Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. PowerReviews, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50426 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
PowerReviews, Inc.
1 N. Dearborn Street Suite 80
Chicago, IL 60602 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 02/22 1:34 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50426] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: PowerReviews, Inc . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 17-50426 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) PowerReviews, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |