Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50428
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Jan 30, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Relo Direct, Inc.
161 N. Clark Street Suite 1200
Chicago, IL 60601
Represented By
Relo Direct, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
10 10 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/30 2:00 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50428] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
9 9 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Mon 01/22 9:29 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 12/19 11:29 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Relo Direct, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Reliance Relocation, Inc.]. (Burke, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 12/19 7:35 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Notice of Extension of Time to File Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 6
Monday, December 18, 2017
6 6 notice Extension of Time to File, Notice of Mon 12/18 3:44 PM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Relo Direct, Inc Related [+]. Adversary Answer due by 1/19/2018. (Burke, Jason)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 notice Appearance Mon 12/18 3:41 PM
Appearance filed by Jason R Burke on behalf of Defendant Relo Direct, Inc. (Burke, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 4:32 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Relo Direct, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 10:10 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 2:43 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 2:42 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50428 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Relo Direct, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other