Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50429
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Feb 09, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sakar International, Inc.
195 Carter Drive
Edison, NJ 08817
Represented By
Sakar International, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph L Steinfeld, Jr.
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Friday, February 09, 2018
6 6 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/09 1:48 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50429] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
5 5 notice Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count Thu 02/01 12:04 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 4:32 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Sakar International, Inc Related [+]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 10:11 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 2:45 PM
Appearance filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 2:45 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50429 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Sakar International, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Steinfeld, Joseph)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other