Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. American Project & Repair, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50433 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 06, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
American Project & Repair, Inc.
28243 Beck Road Unit B2
Wixom, MI 48393 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, February 06, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 02/06 1:53 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50433] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Mon 01/29 1:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 12/20 2:23 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant American Project & Repair, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): American Project & Repair, Inc.]. (Baker, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 12/19 12:39 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Extension of Time to File, Notice of
Tue 12/19 9:36 AM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant American Project & Repair, Inc . Adversary Answer due by 1/19/2018. (Baker, Christopher) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 12/19 9:35 AM
Appearance filed by Christopher E. Baker on behalf of Defendant American Project & Repair, Inc. (Baker, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:08 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: American Project & Repair, Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 10:15 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 2:54 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 2:54 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50433 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) American Project & Repair, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |