Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50445
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Jul 16, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Comosoft, Inc.
2601 Network Blvd., Suite 430
Frisco, TX 75034
Represented By
Comosoft, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
21 21 notice Notice of Submission Wed 10/17 12:41 PM
Notice of Submission of Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Deborah Caruso on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Caruso, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
20 20 court Close Adversary Proceeding Mon 07/16 3:34 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50445] Closed. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 06, 2018
19 19 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Fri 07/06 11:17 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Curt Derek Hochbein, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
18 18 order Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to Fri 03/02 2:09 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Time to file extended to 3/30/2018. Attorney for Defendant Comosoft, Inc. must distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, March 01, 2018
17 17 motion Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to Thu 03/01 11:07 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Appearance Thu 03/01 11:06 AM
Appearance filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2018
15 15 order Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to Thu 02/01 1:54 PM
Order Granting Second Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Time to file extended to 3/2/2018. Attorney for Defendant Comosoft, Inc. must distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
14 14 motion Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to Wed 01/31 9:59 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 29, 2017
13 13 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/29 8:46 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
12 12 order Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to Wed 12/20 12:55 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Time to file extended to 1/31/2018. Attorney for Defendant Comosoft, Inc. must distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 10
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
11 11 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 12/19 12:44 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/2/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 8
10 10 motion Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to Tue 12/19 10:28 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 10:26 AM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Appearance Tue 12/19 10:25 AM
Appearance filed by Deborah Caruso on behalf of Defendant Comosoft, Inc. (Caruso, Deborah)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2017
7 7 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Fri 12/15 12:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Comosoft, Inc Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Fri 12/15 8:53 AM
Alias Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/29/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 1/16/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2017
5 5 cmp Request for Alias Summons Thu 12/14 4:12 PM
Request for Alias Summons re: Comosoft, Inc., filed by Gary D Underdahl Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:50 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Comosoft, Inc Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 3
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
3 3 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 10:45 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 3:21 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 3:21 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50445 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Comosoft, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other