Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Garmin International, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50452 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 17, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Garmin International, Inc.
1200 East 151st Street
Olathe, KS 66062 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/17 3:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50452] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Withdrawal of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Willliam Jeffrey Maloney on behalf of Defendant Garmin International, Inc . (Maloney, Willliam) |
|
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Deficiency Notice Issued re: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Deficiency to be cured by 4/11/2018. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice with Affidavit in Support filed by Willliam Jeffrey Maloney on behalf of Defendant Garmin International, Inc. (Maloney, Willliam) |
|
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/27 5:02 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice 17-50452 [motion,mprohac] (100.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 28359309. Fee amount 100.00 . (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: Garmin International, Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 17-50452 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Garmin International, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |