Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50453
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Aug 17, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
HomeStretch Inc.
146 Furniture Drive
Nettleton, MS 38858
Represented By
HomeStretch Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Eagle Capital Corporation
105 S. Front Street
Tupelo, MS 38801
Represented By
Eagle Capital Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, November 26, 2018
30 30 court Minute Entry/Order Tue 11/27 10:03 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/26/2018, MATTER: Trial: Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5025 ,15 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (292324)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
29 29 court Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/17 10:27 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50453] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 09, 2018
28 28 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Thu 08/09 2:11 PM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Scott Emery Blakeley, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendants Eagle Capital Corporation, HomeStretch Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 25, 2018
27 27 order Scheduling Order Wed 04/25 11:50 AM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Date Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 8/24/18. Exhibit List due by 9/28/2018. Witness List due by 9/28/2018. Trial date set on 11/26/2018 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis(Trial time allotted is 1 day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 26
Tuesday, April 24, 2018
26 26 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 04/25 10:00 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/24/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Amended Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5025 ,15 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289828)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
25 25 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 04/24 10:05 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 5/8/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 21
24 24 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 04/24 10:04 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 5/8/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 20
Monday, April 23, 2018
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/23 6:27 PM
Agreed Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Jesse McNeal Maxwell on behalf of Defendant Eagle Capital Corporation Related [+]. (Maxwell, Jesse)
Related: [-] 21
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Mon 04/23 6:22 PM
Agreed Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Jesse McNeal Maxwell on behalf of Defendant HomeStretch Inc Related [+]. (Maxwell, Jesse)
Related: [-] 20
21 21 notice Appearance Mon 04/23 6:09 PM
Appearance filed by Jesse McNeal Maxwell on behalf of Defendant Eagle Capital Corporation. (Maxwell, Jesse)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Appearance Mon 04/23 6:06 PM
Appearance filed by Jesse McNeal Maxwell on behalf of Defendant HomeStretch Inc. (Maxwell, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 18, 2018
19 19 misc Pretrial Statement Wed 04/18 8:31 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Scott Emery Blakeley, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendants Eagle Capital Corporation, HomeStretch Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 16
Monday, March 19, 2018
18 18 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 03/19 1:38 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendant HomeStretch Inc. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 03/19 1:37 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendant Eagle Capital Corporation. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
16 16 order Setting Pretrial Conference Tue 03/06 2:43 PM
Order Setting Telephonice Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 4/17/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 4/24/2018 at 10:30 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 02, 2018
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/02 3:58 PM
Amended Answer to Complaint filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendants Eagle Capital Corporation, HomeStretch Inc Related [+]. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-] 1
14 14 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 03/02 10:59 AM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 3/16/2018. (wdp)
Related: [-] 12
Thursday, March 01, 2018
13 13 court Consent Language Notice Thu 03/01 1:42 PM
Notice re: Consent Language Related [+]. An amended document must be filed by 03/15/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/28 7:15 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendants Eagle Capital Corporation, HomeStretch Inc Related [+]. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-] 1
11 11 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/28 7:14 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendant Eagle Capital Corporation Related [+]. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-] 7
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/28 7:13 PM
Certificate of Service re: Appearance, filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendant HomeStretch Inc Related [+]. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 02/28 4:08 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 3/14/2018. (wdp)
Related: [-] 7
8 8 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 02/28 4:07 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 3/14/2018. (wdp)
Related: [-] 6
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
7 7 notice Appearance Tue 02/27 5:33 PM
Appearance filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendant Eagle Capital Corporation. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 02/27 5:32 PM
Appearance filed by Scott Emery Blakeley on behalf of Defendant HomeStretch Inc. (Blakeley, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:56 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: HomeStretch Inc.; and Eagle Capital Corporation Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 11:05 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 3:49 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 3:48 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50453 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) HomeStretch Inc., Eagle Capital Corporation [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other