Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50454
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Oct 25, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ingram Micro Inc.
3351 Michelson Drive Suite 100
Irvine, CA 92612
Represented By
Ingram Micro Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, April 25, 2019
25 25 court Minute Entry/Order Vacated Tue 04/30 8:32 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial1 ,10 . Trial vacated. Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed 10/17/2018 (lat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
24 24 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 10/25 7:56 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50454] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
23 23 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Wed 10/17 10:51 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Harley K Means, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 25, 2018
22 22 misc Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing Mon 06/25 4:18 PM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Michael J. Hebenstreit on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Hebenstreit, Michael)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
21 21 misc Mediator, Notice of Selection of Wed 06/13 4:30 PM
Notice of Selection of Mediator Michael Hebenstreit, filed by Harley K Means, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 20
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
20 20 order Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to Tue 06/12 12:11 PM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation Related [+]. Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 6/26/2018. Attorney for Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors must distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, June 11, 2018
19 19 motion Mediation, Motion to Refer to Mon 06/11 12:06 PM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
18 18 order Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to Mon 05/21 11:35 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File /Respond to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Requests for Admission Related [+]. Time to file extended to 6/18/2018. Attorney for Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. must distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-] 17
Thursday, May 17, 2018
17 17 motion Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to Thu 05/17 3:39 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File /Respond to First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production and Requests for Admission filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. (Means, Harley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 17, 2018
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/17 2:02 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 1/18/19. Exhibit List due by 2/22/2019. Witness List due by 2/22/2019. Trial date set on 4/25/2019 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Time allotted for Trial is 1 day. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, April 16, 2018
15 15 court Minute Entry/Order Mon 04/16 2:57 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 04/16/2018, MATTER: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,10 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (288537)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 09, 2018
14 14 misc Pretrial Statement Mon 04/09 11:11 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Harley K Means, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 12
Tuesday, February 06, 2018
13 13 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 02/06 2:57 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Tianjin Tianhai Investment Company, Ltd.]. (Means, Harley)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2018
12 12 order Setting Pretrial Conference Fri 02/02 2:00 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 4/9/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 4/16/2018 at 11:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Fri 02/02 1:57 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 2/16/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 10
Wednesday, January 31, 2018
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 01/31 4:32 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc Related [+]. (Means, Harley)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, December 21, 2017
9 9 order Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to Thu 12/21 10:44 AM
Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to File Answer Related [+]. Time to file extended to 1/31/2018. Attorney for Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. must distribute this order. (lat)
Related: [-] 7
Wednesday, December 20, 2017
8 8 notice Appearance Wed 12/20 3:28 PM
Appearance filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. (Means, Harley)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to Wed 12/20 3:27 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by James A. Knauer on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. (Knauer, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Wed 12/20 3:26 PM
Appearance filed by James A. Knauer on behalf of Defendant Ingram Micro Inc. (Knauer, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:56 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Ingram Micro Inc Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 11:08 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 3:52 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 3:51 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50454 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Ingram Micro Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other