Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50455
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Sep 27, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Logicalis, Inc.
2600 Telegraph Road Suite 200
Bloomfield Township, MI 48302
Represented By
Logicalis, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Thursday, October 18, 2018
16 16 court Minute Entry/Order Fri 10/19 8:33 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 10/18/2018, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,9 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (291458)). (LauraATrepes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 27, 2018
15 15 court Close Adversary Proceeding Thu 09/27 9:46 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50455] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
14 14 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Wed 09/19 9:50 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Curt Derek Hochbein, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Logicalis, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 10, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Tue 04/10 1:57 PM
Scheduling Order Related [+]. Dispositive motions due by 7/27/18. Exhibit List due by 8/24/2018. Witness List due by 8/24/2018. Trial date set on 10/18/2018 at 09:00 AM EDT in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis(Time allotted is one day). The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, April 09, 2018
12 12 court Minute Entry/Order Mon 04/09 2:46 PM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 10/18/18 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines. Defendant consents to entry of final orders and judgment by the Bankruptcy Court Related [+]. (lat)
Related: [-] 1 ,9
Monday, April 02, 2018
11 11 misc Pretrial Statement Mon 04/02 11:10 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Curt Derek Hochbein, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Defendant Logicalis, Inc., Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 10
Thursday, February 01, 2018
10 10 order Setting Pretrial Conference Thu 02/01 1:48 PM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 4/2/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 4/9/2018 at 10:00 AM EDT in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/30 4:23 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Logicalis, Inc Related [+]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-] 1
Friday, December 22, 2017
8 8 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 12/22 11:38 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Logicalis, Inc. [Corporate Parent(s): Logicalis US Holdings, Inc.]. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Appearance Fri 12/22 11:36 AM
Appearance filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Defendant Logicalis, Inc. (Hochbein, Curt)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Appearance Fri 12/22 11:34 AM
Appearance filed by James E Rossow Jr. on behalf of Defendant Logicalis, Inc. (Rossow, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 2:57 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Logicalis, Inc. dba Logicalis Integration Solutions Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 11:10 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 3:57 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 3:54 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50455 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Logicalis, Inc. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other