Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Logitech Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50456 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 12, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Logitech Inc.
7700 Gateway Boulevard
Newark, CA 94560 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 03/12 1:52 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50456] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Fri 03/02 2:11 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 2:58 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Logitech Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 11:29 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 3:57 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 3:56 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50456 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Logitech Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |