Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302

Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey J Graham
Case #: 1:17-ap-50460
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Nov 21, 2017
Terminated:Sep 18, 2018
Last checked: never
Defendant
Sensible Staffing LLC.
901 Shawna Shores
Haines City, FL 33844
Represented By
Sensible Staffing LLC.
contact info
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
Represented By
Gary D Underdahl
Ask LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, January 07, 2019
17 17 court Minute Entry/Order Tue 01/08 1:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/07/2019, MATTER: Trial: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 5021 ,7 DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (289603)). (HHeiserDavis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
16 16 court Close Adversary Proceeding Tue 09/18 10:41 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50460] Closed. (btw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
15 15 notice Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count Mon 09/10 9:24 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Eric J Olson, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Sensible Staffing LLC. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 06, 2018
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/06 4:38 PM
Certificate of Service re: Scheduling Order, filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, February 28, 2018
13 13 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/28 1:05 PM
Order Scheduling Trial and Setting Cut-Off Dates Related [+]. Trial date set on 1/7/2019 at 09:00 AM EST in Rm 311 U.S. Courthouse, Indianapolis. Exhibit List due by 11/9/2018. Witness List due by 11/9/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 10/19/2018. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw)
Related: [-] 12
Monday, February 26, 2018
12 12 court Minute Entry/Order Wed 02/28 8:40 AM
Minute Entry/Order re: Telephonic Pretrial Conference: Complaint To Avoid And Recover Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 547,548,549 and 550 And to Disallow Claims Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 502. Telephonic Pretrial Conference held. Court schedules one (1) day Trial for 1/7/19 at 9:00 am. Scheduling Order to be issued to parties with Trial date and other deadlines Related [+]. (hhd)
Related: [-] 1 ,7
Wednesday, February 14, 2018
11 11 misc Pretrial Statement Wed 02/14 9:56 AM
Joint Pretrial Statement filed by Eric J Olson, Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Defendant Sensible Staffing LLC Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 10
Friday, January 05, 2018
10 10 order Setting Pretrial Conference Fri 01/05 11:35 AM
Order Setting Telephonic Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Statement/Report due by 2/20/2018. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set on 2/26/2018 at 03:30 PM EST in Telephone # 317-229-3960. The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (cmd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
9 9 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 01/04 1:40 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Eric J Olson on behalf of Defendant Sensible Staffing LLC. (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2017
8 8 court Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 12/21 2:52 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Answer to Complaint Related [+]. Deficiency to be cured by 1/4/2018. (cmd)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 12/21 12:52 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Eric J Olson on behalf of Defendant Sensible Staffing LLC Related [+]. (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, December 12, 2017
6 6 notice Appearance Tue 12/12 2:50 PM
Appearance filed by Eric J Olson on behalf of Defendant Sensible Staffing LLC. (Olson, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
5 5 cmp Summons Certificate of Service Wed 11/29 3:00 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Sensible Staffing LLC Related [+]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] 4
Wednesday, November 22, 2017
4 4 court Summons Issued - Original/Alias Wed 11/22 11:55 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw)
Related: [-]
3 3 court 7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 Related [+]. Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, November 21, 2017
2 2 notice Appearance Tue 11/21 4:11 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/21 4:10 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50460 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Sensible Staffing LLC. [12 Related [+]], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - 547 preferencecovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfercovery of money/property - other