Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50463 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 10, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc.
8474 Market Place Drive Suite 104
Southaven, MS 38671 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Sunday, January 20, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Withdraw Document
Sun 01/20 10:15 AM
Withdrawal of Satisfaction of Judgment, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Thu 12/27 11:54 AM
Satisfaction of Judgment filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 10/10 10:16 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50463] Closed. (btw) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Service - Order
Thu 09/27 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Service - ORDER . No. of Notices: 1 Notice Date 09/26/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 24, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment, Order on Motion for
Mon 09/24 11:30 AM
Default Judgment against Defendant(s) Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc . Notice of entry of this order/judgment is hereby provided to parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9022(a) The Clerk's Office will distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Thursday, September 20, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment, Motion for
Thu 09/20 9:37 AM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant(s) filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Clerk's Entry of Default
Mon 08/27 12:31 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default against Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc . (btw) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit
Mon 08/27 10:40 AM
Affidavit re: Application for Entry of Default by Clerk, filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors . (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Default by Clerk, Application for Entry of
Mon 08/27 10:39 AM
Application for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Joseph L Steinfeld Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Steinfeld, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 11/29 3:11 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Wed 11/22 12:04 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Tue 11/21 4:50 PM
Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 4:50 PM
Adversary case[LINK 17-50463 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Stylecraft Home Collection, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |