Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors v. Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-01302
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Jeffrey J Graham |
Case #: | 1:17-ap-50464 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 03, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
2341 Deerfield Drive
Fort Mill, SC 26715 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, of Gregg Appliances, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:07 PM EDT |
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 01/03 11:24 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:17-ap-50464] Closed. (cmd) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons re: Sunbelt Rentals, Inc . (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 12/06/2017 . Adversary Answer due by 12/22/2017. (btw) |
|
3 | 3
court
7-Day Notice of Incomplete Filing
Wed 11/22 1:00 AM
Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Gary Underdahl. Failure to file required item(s) by the due date may result in the striking of the incomplete filing, the dismissal of the Bankruptcy case without further notice, or other action as the Court deems appropriate. Required item(s): A $350.00 filing fee is due for the Complaint filed on 11/21/2017 . Incomplete Filing due by 11/29/2017. (Admin) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Appearance filed by Gary D Underdahl on behalf of Plaintiff Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Underdahl, Gary) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case[LINK 17-50464 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors against Defendant(s) Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. [12 ], [13], [14]. (Underdahl, Gary) |