ULRICH, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE v. STEWART et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-14562
Lead BK case is: 2:16-bk-14562
Arizona Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Madeleine C Wanslee |
Case #: | 2:17-ap-00756 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Nov 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ROY and JANE DOE STEWART
P.O. Box 20913
Mesa, AZ 85277 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOELLEN and JOHN DOE STEWART
1408 North Panorama Creek
Payson, AZ 85441 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DALE D ULRICH, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
2001 East Campbell Avenue Suite 103
Phoenix, AZ 85016 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 1:05 PM MST |
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Dismissal of Complaint (Notice of)
Fri 01/26 11:50 AM
Notice of Dismissal of Complaint filed by MICHAEL P. LANE of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DALE D ULRICH, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE. (LANE, MICHAEL) |
|
court
Close Adversary
Fri 01/26 2:45 PM
Adversary Terminated . (Taylor, Erika) |
||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
other
Certificate of Service
Wed 11/22 9:22 AM
Certificate of Service filed by MICHAEL P. LANE of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DALE D ULRICH, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE. (LANE, MICHAEL) |
|
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued (Form)
Wed 11/22 7:30 AM
Summons Issued . (Taylor, Erika) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 11/21 3:04 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by MICHAEL P. LANE of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DALE D ULRICH, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE. (LANE, MICHAEL) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/21 3:01 PM
Adversary case 2:17-ap-00756. Complaint (350.00 fee) against ROY and JANE DOE STEWART, JOELLEN and JOHN DOE STEWART filed by MICHAEL P. LANE of LANE & NACH, P.C. on behalf of DALE D ULRICH, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE Nature of Suit: 12 TO AVOID PREFERENCE PAYMENTS . (LANE, MICHAEL) |