Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Steven D Merryday
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:17-cv-02847
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 27, 2017
Terminated:Sep 27, 2018
Last checked: Saturday May 26, 2018 5:42 AM EDT
Defendant
ILPEA Industries, Inc.
Represented By
Hughes Hamilton Rice, III
Bush Graziano Rice & Platter PA
contact info
Sean G. Williamson
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP
contact info
Donald J. Kelly
Wyatt, Tarrant & Combs, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Winsulator Corporation
Represented By
Michael Lane Morgan
Michael L Morgan Law Group PA
contact info
Michele S. Stephan
Legal On Your Own, P.A.
contact info
Christina E. Unkel
Maglio Christopher & Toale, PA
contact info
Michael L. Morgan
Michael L Morgan Law Group PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Mediator
Peter J. Grilli
Terminated: 05/01/2018
Peter J. Grilli, P.A. 3001 W. Azeele St.
Tampa, FL 33609
Represented By
Peter John Grilli
Peter J. Grilli, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, September 27, 2018
44 44 1 pgs order Order dismissing case Thu 09/27 1:45 PM
ORDER dismissing the action without prejudice; directing the clerk to TERMINATE any pending motion and to CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/27/2018. (BK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 05, 2018
43 43 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Expedite Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 09/05 1:25 PM
ORDER granting 40 --motion by Christine E. Unkel to withdraw as counsel for Winsulator; attorney Christina E. Unkel terminated; denying motion to stay; denying as moot 38 --motion to expedite. Winsulator's new counsel must appear no later than 9/21/2018 and respond to ILPEA's motion (Doc. 35 ). Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 9/5/2018. (BK) Attachment modified on 9/5/2018 (BK)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/05 10:01 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Winsulator Corporation.(Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
41 41 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Wed 09/05 8:56 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Winsulator Corporation. (Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
40 40 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 08/31 4:11 PM
MOTION for Christina E. Unkel to withdraw as attorney by Winsulator Corporation.(Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Withdraw
Friday, August 24, 2018
39 39 respm Response to motion Fri 08/24 2:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re38 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Waive 10-Day Notice to File Motion to Withdraw filed by ILPEA Industries, Inc.. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 23, 2018
38 38 motion Expedite Thu 08/23 11:01 AM
Emergency MOTION to Expedite Waive 10-Day Notice to File Motion to Withdraw by Winsulator Corporation.(Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, August 22, 2018
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/22 8:50 AM
NOTICE by Winsulator Corporation of Charging Lien (Morgan, Michael)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Wed 08/22 8:49 AM
TERMINATED--RE-FILED (#37)NOTICE by Winsulator Corporation of Charging Lien (Morgan, Michael) Modified on 8/22/2018 (CTR)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 17, 2018
35 35 motion Strike Fri 08/17 4:00 PM
MOTION to Strike Pl's Identification of Experts and to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert David M. Paul by ILPEA Industries, Inc..(Kelly, Donald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Pl's Identification of Experts,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Emails between Kelly and Unkel
Wednesday, June 06, 2018
34 34 2 pgs order Order on motion to modify Thu 06/07 10:52 AM
ORDER granting 33 Parties' Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motions. Plaintiff's disclosure expert testimony deadline: June 29, 2018; Defendant's disclosure expert testimony deadline: August 13, 2018; Deadline for supplementation of disclosure and responses: September 10, 2018; Discovery deadline: October 31, 2018; Discovery-related motions deadline: November 12, 2018; Dispositive motion deadline: November 26, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/6/2018. (DMS)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Modify Wed 06/06 10:45 AM
Joint MOTION to modify Case Management Order by Winsulator Corporation. (Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 30, 2018
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Thu 05/31 11:11 AM
ORDER granting 31 plaintiff's Motion and Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel. Attorneys Michael Lane Morgan and Michele S. Stephan terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/30/2018. (DMS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 29, 2018
31 31 motion Substitute Attorney Tue 05/29 2:01 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 22, 2018
30 30 notice Notice of appearance Tue 05/22 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina E. Unkel on behalf of Winsulator Corporation (Unkel, Christina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 03, 2018
29 29 2 pgs order Order on motion to modify Fri 05/04 12:07 PM
ORDER granting 28 Parties' Joint Motion to Modify Case Management Order to Extend Time for Discovery and Dispositive Motions. Plaintiff's Expert Testimony Disclosure: 5/29/2018; Defendant's Expert Testimony Disclosure: 7/13/2018; Deadline for supplementation of disclosures and responses: 8/10/2018; Discovery deadline: 9/28/2018; Discovery-related motions deadline: 10/12/2018; Dispositive motion deadline: 10/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/4/2018. (DMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 02, 2018
28 28 motion Modify Wed 05/02 9:39 AM
Joint MOTION to modify CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR DISCOVERY AND DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Winsulator Corporation. (Morgan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 01, 2018
27 27 motion Modify Tue 05/01 4:21 PM
***TERMINATED--COUNSEL ON SIGNATURE LINE DOES NOT MATCH COUNSEL OF ENTRY-COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE***Joint MOTION to modify to Modify Case Management Order to Extend Time for Discovery and Dispositive Motions by Winsulator Corporation. (Morgan, Michael) Modified on 5/1/2018 (CTR)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 30, 2018
26 26 adr Mediation report Mon 04/30 3:27 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on April 30, 2018. Hearing outcome: The parties have reached an impasse.. (Grilli, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2018
25 25 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Tue 02/27 1:55 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 4/30/2018 at 10:00am before Peter J. Grilli, Esq.. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2018
24 24 order Order on motion to extend time Fri 02/23 5:46 PM
ORDER granting 23 Motion to extend time for mediation until April 30, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/23/2018. (Wilson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extend time Fri 02/23 11:51 AM
MOTION to extend time to April 30, 2018 by All Defendants. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2018
22 22 order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Order appointing mediator/scheduling mediation Thu 02/08 5:50 PM
ORDER appointing Peter J. Grilli as mediator; designating Hughes Rice as lead counsel; setting 3/29/2018 as the mediation deadline; directing counsel to file a notice within twenty days giving the date and time of mediation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/8/2018. (GSO)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2018
21 21 order Case management and scheduling order Mon 02/05 10:37 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 12A before Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson; jury trial scheduled for the January 2019 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 2/5/2018. (GSO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2018
20 20 respoth Reply to affirmative defenses Thu 01/25 1:58 PM
REPLY to affirmative defenses by Winsulator Corporation. (Stephan, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2018
19 19 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 01/22 4:26 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand by ILPEA Industries, Inc..(Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2018
18 18 1 pgs order Order on motion to dismiss Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 01/12 9:02 AM
ORDER granting 6 --motion to dismiss the negligence claim in count two; denying as moot 15 --motion for an order approving stipulation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 1/12/2018. (BK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2018
17 17 2 pgs order Order on motion to appear pro hac vice Thu 01/11 5:21 PM
ORDER granting 11 defendant's motion for Sean G. Williamson to appear pro hac vice; granting 12 defendant's motion for Donald J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 1/11/2018. (DMS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2018
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Wed 01/10 5:30 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Sean G. Williamson, appearing on behalf of ILPEA Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA048057) Related document:11 MOTION for Sean G. Williamson to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fees paid Wed 01/10 5:33 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Donald J. Kelly, appearing on behalf of ILPEA Industries, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA048045) Related document:12 MOTION for Donald J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2018
16 16 misc Certificate of compliance Tue 01/09 2:19 PM
***TERMINATED-DISCOVERY***CERTIFICATE of compliance with Rule 26 Disclosure by Winsulator Corporation. (Stephan, Michele) Modified on 1/9/2018 (CTR). (CTR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2018
15 15 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 01/08 1:04 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to approve stipulation regarding Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal by Winsulator Corporation. (Stephan, Michele)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Mon 01/08 1:01 PM
STIPULATION as to Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal by Winsulator Corporation. (Stephan, Michele)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2018
13 13 misc Case Management Report Thu 01/04 3:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/04 11:56 AM
MOTION for Donald J. Kelly to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/04 11:54 AM
MOTION for Sean G. Williamson to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
misc Mail Returned Thu 01/04 4:05 PM
Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Mail sent to Brown, Clark, Christopher & DeMay, P.A. 1800 Second Street Suite 806 Sarasota, FL 34236, Return to sender; not deliverable as addressed. Mail resent to Michael L. Morgan Morgan Law Group, PA 2364 Fruitville Road Sarasota, FL 34237. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
misc Mail Returned Wed 01/03 2:57 PM
Mail returned from address 1800 Second Street Suite 806 Sarasota, FL 34236 as Undeliverable re:3 Notice of designation of track,4 Order. Returned to sender; wrong address. Mail resent to Michael L. Morgan at Morgan Law Group, PA 2364 Fruitville Road Sarasota, FL 34237. (LMD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 19, 2017
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 12/19 4:26 PM
ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time until January 8, 2018, to File Response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 12/19/2017. (Wilson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2017
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 12/18 12:31 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Winsulator Corporation. (Stephan, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2017
8 8 notice Notice of pendency of related cases Wed 12/13 11:38 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Order Designating Case as Track Two per Local Rule 1.04(d) by ILPEA Industries, Inc.. Related case(s): NO (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2017
7 7 notice Notice of appearance Mon 12/11 2:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michele S. Stephan on behalf of Winsulator Corporation (Stephan, Michele)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2017
6 6 motion Dismiss Mon 12/04 4:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by ILPEA Industries, Inc.. (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 12/04 4:21 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by ILPEA Industries, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ilpea Parent, Inc. for ILPEA Industries, Inc... (Rice, Hughes)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2017
4 4 11 pgs order Order Wed 11/29 3:00 PM
ORDER re 3 notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 11/29/2017. (GSO)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of designation of track Wed 11/29 2:56 PM
NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2017
2 2 cmp Complaint Mon 11/27 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against ILPEA Industries, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Winsulator Corporation. Filed in state court 11/7/2017.(CTR)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 11/27 3:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the 12th Judicial Circuit, in and for Sarasota County, Florida, case number 17-CA-5449 filed in State Court on 11/7/2017. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA047343 filed by ILPEA Industries, Inc..(CTR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet