Johnson v. Chen et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maria-Elena James |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-06798 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans w/ Disabilities Act (ADA) |
Case Filed: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday May 27, 2018 2:32 AM PDT |
Defendant
Maureen Chen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DCP JL Triton SF, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 04/19 4:23 AM
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice filed by Scott Johnson.(Grace, Phyl) (Filed on 4/19/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate/Proof of Service | ||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 03/09 5:29 PM
ORDER re 18 Notice (Other) filed by Scott Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/9/2018. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2018) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 03/07 11:26 AM
NOTICE by Scott Johnson of Settlement Jointly Filed(Grace, Phyl) (Filed on 3/7/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Wed 02/14 3:40 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER TO INITIAL COMPLAINT filed by Maureen Chen, DCP JL Triton SF, LLC, ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC. (Cruz, Marion) (Filed on 2/14/2018) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 01/18 4:07 PM
STIPULATION STIPULATED REQUEST FOR ORDER CHANGING TIME TO ANSWER INITIAL COMPLAINT AND TO HOLD JOINT INSPECTION OF PREMISES filed by Maureen Chen, DCP JL Triton SF, LLC, ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC.(Cruz, Marion) (Filed on 1/18/2018) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
15 | 15
misc
Association of Counsel
Thu 01/18 3:55 PM
ASSOCIATION of Counsel NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS DCP JL TRITON SF, LLC, MAUREEN CHEN AND ERC 334-352 GRANT AVENUE, LLC by Maureen Chen, DCP JL Triton SF, LLC, ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC. (Catlos, Katherine) (Filed on 1/18/2018) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 01/17 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Katherine S. Catlos Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney for ERC 334-352 GRANT AVENUE, LLC (Catlos, Katherine) (Filed on 1/17/2018) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 01/17 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Katherine S. Catlos Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney for Maureen Chen (Catlos, Katherine) (Filed on 1/17/2018) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 12/29 1:20 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. (Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 12/29/2017) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Thu 12/21 5:53 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer to Initial Complaint filed by Maureen Chen, ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC. (Ficks, Gregg) (Filed on 12/21/2017) |
|
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 12/20 9:50 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Johnson. Maureen Chen served on 12/4/2017, answer due 12/26/2017. (Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 12/20/2017) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Fri 12/01 2:53 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Scott Johnson.. (Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 12/1/2017) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Wed 11/29 12:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Maureen Chen, DCP JL Triton SF, LLC, ERC 334-352 Grant Avenue, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2017) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order - ADA Case
Wed 11/29 11:55 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
5 | 5
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 11/28 10:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/12/2017. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 11/28 6:13 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Scott Johnson . (Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 11/28 6:12 AM
Proposed Summons. (Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities
Tue 11/28 6:11 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Scott Johnson re1 Complaint, (Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 11/28 6:10 AM
COMPLAINT For Damages And Injunctive Relief For Violations Of: Americans With Disabilities Act; Unruh Civil Rights Act against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11906168.). Filed byScott Johnson.(Masanque, Isabel Rose) (Filed on 11/28/2017) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Friday, November 24, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 11/29 12:27 PM
**erroneous docket entry*** (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2017) Modified on 11/29/2017 (hdjS, COURT STAFF) |